Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister Charles-Maurice de Talleyrand-Périgord

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (Renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1754Born
19 Dec 177925.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Nov 178834.7SelectedBishop of Autun, France
15 Dec 178834.8ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
4 Jan 178934.9Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
13 Apr 179137.1ResignedBishop of Autun, France
29 Jun 180248.4Laicized
17 May 183884.2Died

MicroData Summary for Charles-Maurice de Talleyrand-Périgord
Mister Charles-Maurice de Talleyrand-Périgord (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 22.5 years (Laicized)
  • a bishop for 13.4 years (Laicized)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast