Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stariha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lead, South Dakota, USA

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1845Born
19 Sep 186924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
187125.6IncardinatedPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
6 Aug 190257.2AppointedBishop of Lead, South Dakota, USA
28 Oct 190257.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lead, South Dakota, USA
8 Nov 190964.4ResignedBishop of Lead, South Dakota, USA
8 Nov 190964.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
15 Dec 191570.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lead, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Stariha
Bishop John Stariha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lead

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSemič, Slovenia

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast