Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakobus von Stammler

Deceased

Bishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1840Born
19 Jul 186323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
4 Jul 190666.0SelectedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
7 Aug 190666.1ConfirmedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
30 Sep 190666.3Ordained BishopBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
13 Apr 192584.8DiedBishop of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jakobus von Stammler
Bishop Jakobus von Stammler (born , died ) Bishop of Basel e Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBremgarten
Ordained BishopCathedral, Soleure

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 60
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast