Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Soto y Mancera

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1849Born
14 Nov 190455.7AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
24 Feb 190555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
31 Jan 191060.9DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Félix Soto y Mancera
Bishop Félix Soto y Mancera (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZafra
Ordained BishopS. Miguel, Church, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast