Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Solís Hervás, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹Born
1674²17.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
8 Aug 170144.6AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
21 Dec 170144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
22 Jun 171356.4SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
18 Nov 171356.8SelectedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
17 Jan 171457.0ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
14 Oct 171659.7DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco Solís Hervás
Bishop Francisco Solís Hervás O. de M. (born 1657, died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 21, Number 15
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 66, and Page 172
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 227
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,589

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast