Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Saulini

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1825Born
22 Apr 184823.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187651.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tivoli, Italy
26 Jun 187651.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
2 Jul 187651.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
28 Feb 187953.9AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
26 May 188762.1DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Saulini (VIAF: 233248341)
Bishop Pietro Saulini (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivitella di Subiaco, Territorial Abbey of Subiaco
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 84, and Page 482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast