Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho José (Benito) Sartori, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1929Born
15 Aug 195223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Feb 197040.7AppointedBishop of Palmas, Brazil
26 Apr 197040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Palmas, Brazil
24 Aug 200576.2RetiredBishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
6 Jun 201283.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Agostinho José (Benito) Sartori
Bishop Agostinho José (Benito) Sartori O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapinzal
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de la Merci, Church, Curitiba, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2005
  • d: CB, 6 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 501
  • fn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast