Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raniero Sarnari

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1845Born
21 Sep 186722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 186722.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 190054.8AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
20 May 190054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
9 Jun 190257.0AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
25 Jan 191670.6DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raniero Sarnari
Bishop Raniero Sarnari (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 357, and Page 484
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,825
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast