Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso María de la Cruz (Fernando) Sardinas y Zavala, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huánuco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1842Born
5 Dec 185715.5EnteredMember of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
18 Dec 186220.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
9 Sep 186624.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
3 Mar 186724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
31 Oct 188947.4SelectedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
12 Aug 189048.2ConfirmedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
11 Jan 189148.6Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru
9 Jul 189149.1InstalledBishop of Huánuco, Peru
26 Jun 190260.0DiedBishop of Huánuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Alfonso María de la Cruz (Fernando) Sardinas y Zavala
Bishop Alfonso María de la Cruz (Fernando) Sardinas y Zavala O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Huánuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuánuco, Diocese of Huánuco
Ordained BishopOratory of the Discalced Franciscans, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima
Death PlaceHuánuco, Diocese of Huánuco
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Crypt, Huánuco, Diocese of Huánuco

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 310
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 200
  • c1: CB, 12 Feb 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 1
  • mn/ente/loc: CB, 25 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast