Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saturnino Rubio y Montiél

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osma-Soria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1889Born
19 Sep 191424.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 194455.0AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
6 May 194555.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
4 Dec 196980.0RetiredBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
4 Dec 196980.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
10 Dec 197081.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
23 Apr 197181.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Osma-Soria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Saturnino Rubio y Montiél
Bishop Saturnino Rubio y Montiél (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osma-Soria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Molinos de Ocón
Ordained BishopSan Nicolas, Church, Ebro, Diocese of Osma

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast