Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Rossi, C.S.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Lebessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1879Born
26 Aug 189920.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
26 Aug 190526.2Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
23 May 193858.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
23 May 193858.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebessus
8 Aug 193859.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebessus
22 Jan 194161.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Rossi
Bishop Giorgio Rossi C.S.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Napo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovereto, Diocese of Trento, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast