Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mauro Ramalho de Alarcón Santiago

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1925Born
5 Dec 194823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
13 Oct 196136.4AppointedBishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
6 Jan 196236.6Ordained BishopBishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
4 Feb 196236.7InstalledBishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
26 Jul 200075.1RetiredBishop of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil
9 Dec 201994.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Iguatu, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Mauro Ramalho de Alarcón Santiago
Bishop José Mauro Ramalho de Alarcón Santiago (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iguatu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRussas
Death PlaceSão Camilo, Hospital, Iguatu, Diocese of Iguatu, Ceara
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Iguatu, Diocese of Iguatu, Ceara

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 57.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 4
  • opd/c1/i: CB, 8 Dec 2018
  • d: CB, 9 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast