Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín Roberto Radrizzani, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1944Born
5 Jan 196823.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Mar 197227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 May 199146.6AppointedBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
20 Jul 199146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
17 Aug 199146.9InstalledBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
24 Apr 200156.5AppointedBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
23 Jun 200156.7InstalledBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
27 Dec 200763.2AppointedArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
4 Oct 201975.0RetiredArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
2 Sep 202075.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Agustín Roberto Radrizzani
Archbishop Agustín Roberto Radrizzani S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellaneda
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopNuestra Senora de la Guardia, Church, Bernal
Death PlaceInterzonal General de Agudos, Hospital, Junín

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,642
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2019
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2020
  • c1: CB, 4 Sep 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Apr 2021

Quantcast