Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Fintan Power

Deceased

Bishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1877Born
10 Mar 190629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
12 May 191134.2AppointedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
25 Jul 191134.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
6 Mar 192043.0DiedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Fintan Power
Bishop Michael Fintan Power (born , died ) Bishop of Saint George’s

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. John's, Newfoundland, Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. John's, Newfoundland, Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1911, Number 59
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,632

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast