Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Fernández Piérola y Lopez de Luzuriaca

Deceased

Bishop of Vitoria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1829Born
1853¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 187949.8AppointedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
9 Nov 187950.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
17 Mar 188757.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
30 Dec 188960.3AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
25 Jan 190474.3DiedBishop of Vitoria, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Fernández Piérola y Lopez de Luzuriaca
Bishop Ramón Fernández Piérola y Lopez de Luzuriaca (born , died ) Bishop of Vitoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOtiñano, Diocese of Pamplona
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 70, and Page 202
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 590
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 67
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast