Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Soundaraj Periyanayagam, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vellore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1949Born
24 May 197020.9ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Jun 198334.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Jul 200657.0AppointedBishop of Vellore, India
24 Aug 200657.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vellore, India
21 Mar 202070.7DiedBishop of Vellore, India

MicroData Summary for Soundaraj Periyanayagam
Bishop Soundaraj Periyanayagam S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Vellore

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeriya Kolappalur
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Cathedral, Vellore, Diocese of Vellore
Death PlaceSt. Thomas, Hospital, Chetpet, Diocese of Vellore

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • c2/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,226
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast