Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis T. O’Connor, C.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1841Born
24 Jun 186019.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of St. Basil
8 Dec 186322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of St. Basil
18 Jul 189049.3AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
19 Oct 189049.5Ordained BishopBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
7 Jan 189957.7AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
3 May 189958.0InstalledArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
4 May 190867.1ResignedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
4 May 190867.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
30 Jun 191170.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Denis T. O’Connor
Archbishop Denis T. O’Connor C.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePickering, Diocese of Kingston, Ontario
Ordained BishopLondon, Diocese of London, Ontario
Death PlaceSt. Basil's Novitiate, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario
Buried Place (Original)Basilian plot, Mount Hope, Cemetery, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 348, and Page 559
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast