Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Natoli

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1829Born
5 Jun 185223.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189061.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
13 Jul 189061.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
23 Aug 189869.3DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Natoli
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Natoli (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLipari, Diocese of Lipari
Ordained BishopMessina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 346
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 45
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast