Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Inácio Müller, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1960 Born
14 Apr 198524.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
3 Dec 198828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Sep 201353.2AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Dec 201353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jan 201453.5InstalledBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 May 201958.9AppointedArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Jul 201959.0InstalledArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Inácio Müller
Archbishop João Inácio Müller O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Campinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Clara do Sol
Ordained BishopSão Francisco Xavier, Church, Santa Clara do Sol

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Campinas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2013
  • ob: CB, 25 Sep 2013
  • c2+/i: CB, 17 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 161
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,994
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2019
  • i: CB, 16 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast