Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José da Cruz Moreira Pinto

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1887Born
16 Jan 191022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guarda, Portugal
9 May 192840.6AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
15 Jun 192840.7Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
12 Nov 196477.2DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José da Cruz Moreira Pinto
Bishop José da Cruz Moreira Pinto (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTortozendo

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1928, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast