Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Faustino Moreira dos Santos, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1885Born
28 Oct 190924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
1 Jun 191934.0AppointedPrefect of Lower Congo {Congo Inferiore}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Jan 194155.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
13 Jul 194156.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
27 Jul 195570.1DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Faustino Moreira dos Santos
Bishop Faustino Moreira dos Santos C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Miguel de Gandra
Ordained BishopSão Domingos, Church, Viana do Castelo, Archdiocese of Braga, Portugal

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 42
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast