Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Manuel Medina y Olmos

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1869Born
19 Dec 189122.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 192556.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Granada, Spain
14 Dec 192556.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amorium
23 May 192656.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amorium
2 Oct 192859.1AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
30 Aug 193667.0DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain
10 Oct 1993Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Manuel Medina y Olmos
Bishop Bl. Manuel Medina y Olmos (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanteira

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 32
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast