Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Giacinto Melchiori, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1862Born
28 Sep 192158.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
28 Sep 192158.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Methone
20 Nov 192159.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Methone
12 Jun 192259.6SucceededArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
31 Oct 192866.0DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giacinto Melchiori
Archbishop Francesco Giacinto Melchiori O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBieno di Valsugana, Diocese of Trento, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast