Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Julio Maria Mattioli, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Acre e Purus, Acre, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1902Born
9 Aug 192523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
1941²38.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus, Brazil
10 Jan 194845.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
10 Jan 194845.4AppointedPrelate of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus, Brazil
25 Jul 194846.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
13 Apr 196259.7DiedPrelate of Acre e Purus, Acre, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antônio Julio Maria Mattioli
Bishop Antônio Julio Maria Mattioli O.S.M. (born , died ) Prelate of Acre e Purus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerra Capanne, Italy

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast