Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Daniel Martínez Perea

Bishop Emeritus of San Luis, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1956 Born
17 Dec 198125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mendoza, Argentina
198629.8IncardinatedPriest of San Rafael, Argentina
7 Dec 200953.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Luis, Argentina
19 Mar 201054.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of San Luis, Argentina
22 Feb 201154.9SucceededBishop of San Luis, Argentina
9 Jun 202064.2ResignedBishop of San Luis, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro Daniel Martínez Perea
Bishop Pedro Daniel Martínez Perea (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Luis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMendoza
Ordained BishopSan Rafael Arcángel, Cathedral, San Rafael, Diocese of San Rafael

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Luis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,589
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast