Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Julián Margni

Auxiliary Bishop of Quilmes, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Stephaniacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1971 Born
24 Sep 199928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Quilmes, Argentina
5 Dec 201746.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quilmes, Argentina
5 Dec 201746.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
16 Mar 201846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Julián Margni
Bishop Marcelo Julián Margni (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Quilmes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellaneda, Diocese of Avellaneda
Ordained BishopOutdoors, in front of, Cathedral, Quilmes, Diocese of Quilmes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quilmes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2018
  • loc: CB, 16 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,689

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast