Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Javier Mart璯ez Castillo

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Puebla de los 聲geles, M憖ico

Titular Bishop of Nepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1974 Born
10 Jan 200429.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Puebla de los 聲geles, M憖ico
25 Jun 200429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los 聲geles, M憖ico
16 Oct 202348.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los 聲geles, M憖ico
16 Oct 202348.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
Jan 2024³49.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Mart璯ez Castillo
Father Francisco Javier Mart璯ez Castillo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Puebla de los 聲geles

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla de los 聲geles, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles
Ordained DeaconCathedral Basilica, Puebla de los 聲geles, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles
Ordained PriestCathedral Basilica, Puebla de los 聲geles, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles
Ordained BishopPuebla de los 聲geles, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2023
  • c01/loc: CB, 16 Oct 2023
  • ob: CB, 23 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 24 Oct 2023