Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Masnou Boixeda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1907Born
21 Mar 193123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vic, Spain
15 Aug 195244.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vic, Spain
15 Aug 195244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
23 Nov 195245.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
2 Dec 195548.2AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
20 Jun 198375.7RetiredBishop of Vic, Spain
9 Jun 200496.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Masnou Boixeda
Bishop Ramón Masnou Boixeda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Eugenia de Berga
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vic, Diocese of Vic

  • a priest for 73.2 years
  • a bishop for 51.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 108
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,683

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast