Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygmunt Konstanty Antoni Łoziński

Deceased

Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1870Born
23 Jun 189524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Minsk, Belarus
2 Nov 191747.3AppointedBishop of Minsk, Belarus
28 Jul 191848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Minsk, Belarus
28 Oct 192555.3AppointedBishop of Pinsk, Belarus
26 Mar 193261.7DiedBishop of Pinsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Konstanty Antoni Łoziński
Bishop Zygmunt Konstanty Antoni Łoziński (born , died ) Bishop of Pinsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoracin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,847

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast