Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Pérez de Lanciego Eguiluz y Mirafuentes, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹Born
21 Mar 171457.2AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
4 Nov 171457.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
25 Jan 172871.0DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Pérez de Lanciego Eguiluz y Mirafuentes
Archbishop José Pérez de Lanciego Eguiluz y Mirafuentes O.S.B. (born 1657, died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViana, Spain
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 31, Number 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 267
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,500

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast