Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspard du Laurens, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1567Born
27 Jun 160537.7AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
10 Aug 160537.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arles, France
12 Jul 163062.8DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspard du Laurens (VIAF: 28146522401232391663)
Archbishop Gaspard du Laurens O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarascon
Ordained BishopSaint-Victor, Abbey, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast