Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Auguste Labeuche

Deceased

Bishop of Belley, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1851Born
5 Sep 187523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
13 Jul 190654.7AppointedBishop of Belley, France
19 Aug 190654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
18 Mar 191058.3DiedBishop of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for François-Auguste Labeuche
Bishop François-Auguste Labeuche (born , died ) Bishop of Belley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHyémondans

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast