Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor Kubina

Deceased

Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1880Born
27 Oct 190626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
14 Dec 192545.6AppointedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
2 Feb 192645.7Ordained BishopBishop of Częstochowa, Poland
13 Feb 195170.8DiedBishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Teodor Kubina (VIAF: 67672349)
Bishop Teodor Kubina (born , died ) Bishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŚwiętochłowice, Diocese of Katowice
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopAssumption of Mary, Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Death PlaceCzęstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Crypt, Holy Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1926, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Apr 2021

Quantcast