Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iosif Ioan de Camillis, O.S.B.M †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia

Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1641Born
5 Nov 168947.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
5 Nov 1689³47.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
5 Nov 168947.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
22 Aug 170664.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iosif Ioan de Camillis
Bishop Iosif Ioan de Camillis O.S.B.M (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePresov

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 347
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,157
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 12
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,774

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast