Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Kirchgässner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Druas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1928Born
30 May 195425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Nov 197951.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Nov 197951.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Druas
10 Feb 198051.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druas
31 Dec 199870.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
26 Mar 201485.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Kirchgässner
Bishop Wolfgang Kirchgässner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMannheim
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral, Freiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast