Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Alojzy Junosza Gzowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1732³Born
17 Apr 175623.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jun 175623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Sep 178249.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Sep 178249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
29 Dec 178250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
178653.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Alojzy Junosza Gzowski
Bishop Franciszek Alojzy Junosza Gzowski (born , died 1786) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilnius, Diocese of Vilnius
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vilnius, Diocese of Vilnius

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,988

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast