Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janez Jenko

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Koper, Slovenia

Note/Previous Titular See: (AA of the portions in Slovenia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1910Born
8 Jul 193424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
20 Apr 196453.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
17 Jul 196454.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
17 Jul 196454.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper), Italy
17 Jul 196454.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
6 Sep 196454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acufida
17 Oct 197767.4AppointedBishop of Koper, Slovenia
15 Apr 198776.9RetiredBishop of Koper, Slovenia
24 Dec 199484.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Koper, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Janez Jenko
Bishop Janez Jenko (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Koper

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMavcice

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • c1/b: CB, 16 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast