Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Jarrín y Moro

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1843Born
9 Mar 186824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
6 Dec 190663.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
1 May 190764.1Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 Nov 191269.6DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Jarrín y Moro
Bishop Francisco Jarrín y Moro (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salamanca, Diocese of Salamanca

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,064

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast