Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrijan Holovnja (Hołownia), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Titular Bishop of the Titular See

Titular See: Orša (Orsha)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1750Born
11 Jun 176616.1EnteredMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
17 Jun 176717.1ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1772²21.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
22 Sep 180959.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilno (Ukrainian), Lithuania
22 Sep 180959.4AppointedTitular Bishop of the Titular See
1811²60.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Jan 181160.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of the Titular See
1828²77.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
13 Feb 183180.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adrijan Holovnja (Hołownia)
Bishop Adrijan Holovnja (Hołownia) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitebsk
Ordained BishopVilnius, Diocese of Vilno (Ukrainian)

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,778
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1811, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,462
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,135
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 257, and Page 294, and Page 307
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,965
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,085
  • titu: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 362
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,158
  • b: CB, 13 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast