Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lev (Leon) Javorskyj (Jaworowski), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1764³Born
1806²41.3AppointedAdministrator of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
1807²42.3ResignedAdministrator of Supraśl (Ukrainian), Belarus
14 Feb 180944.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Brėst (Ukrainian)
22 Sep 180945.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz)
27 Jan 181146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz)
1828²63.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania
1833²68.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci (Ukrainian), Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lev (Leon) Javorskyj (Jaworowski)
Bishop Lev (Leon) Javorskyj (Jaworowski) O.S.B.M. (born , died 1833) Auxiliary Bishop of Žyrovyci

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVilnius, Diocese of Vilno (Ukrainian)

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,779
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1811, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,463
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,136
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 260, and Page 293, and Page 307
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,966
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,086
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,278
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast