Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemy-Pierre-Joseph-Marie-Henri Hanrion, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dapaong, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1914Born
19 Dec 194228.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 194329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Mar 196046.2AppointedPrefect of Dapango, Togo
6 Jul 196551.4AppointedBishop of Dapango, Togo
9 Jan 196651.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dapango, Togo
18 Sep 198470.6ResignedBishop of Dapango, Togo
26 Apr 200086.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Dapaong, Togo

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy-Pierre-Joseph-Marie-Henri Hanrion (VIAF: 204999934)
Bishop Barthélemy-Pierre-Joseph-Marie-Henri Hanrion O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dapaong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenay, Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
Ordained DeaconMissions Étrangères, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Dapango, Diocese of Dapango
Death PlaceOrsay, Diocese of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 306
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast