Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elie Bechara Haddad, B.S.

Archbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1960 Born
26 Jul 197919.4ProfessedMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
3 Sep 198323.5Solemn VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
9 Jul 198626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
11 Oct 200646.7SelectedArchbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
27 Jan 200746.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Mar 200747.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Elie Bechara Haddad
Archbishop Elie Bechara Haddad B.S. (born ) Archbishop of Saïdā (Sidone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAblah
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Saïdā (Sidone) (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2007
  • op/ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,355
  • prof/sole: CB, 31 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast