Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crescenzio Maria Grippi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1725Born
27 May 174923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Policastro, Italy
19 Dec 178560.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amorium
22 Jan 178660.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amorium
6 Dec 179873.3DiedTitular Bishop of Amorium

MicroData Summary for Crescenzio Maria Grippi
Bishop Crescenzio Maria Grippi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Amorium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccagloriosa, Diocese of Policastro, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Real Convento di Monteoliveto, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 80
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 3
  • d/loc: AT, 16 Jun 2018
  • d/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast