Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Joaquim de Medeiros

Deceased

Bishop of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1846Born
29 Aug 188235.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa, India
29 Aug 188235.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
15 Apr 188336.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
4 Sep 188437.8SelectedBishop of Macau, China
13 Nov 188438.0ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
7 Jan 189750.2DiedBishop of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Antônio Joaquim de Medeiros (VIAF: 99732810)
Bishop Antônio Joaquim de Medeiros (born , died ) Bishop of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillar de Nantes, Archdiocese of Braga, Portugal
Ordained BishopGoa, Archdiocese of Goa, India
Death PlaceTimor

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 358, and Page 548
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 16
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast