Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mate Garković

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1882Born
28 Jul 190724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
22 Feb 195269.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
22 Feb 195269.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
30 Mar 195269.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
24 Dec 196078.2AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
26 May 196885.7DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Mate Garković
Archbishop Mate Garković (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeli Rat

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1952, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast