Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Demetrio Gallaro

Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Titular Archbishop of Trecalae

Apostolic Administrator of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1948 Born
1971²22.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Los Angeles, California, USA
27 May 197224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
Sep 1987³39.6IncardinatedPriest of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
31 Mar 201567.2AppointedBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
28 Jun 201567.4Ordained BishopBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
25 Feb 202072.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
25 Feb 202072.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trecalae
25 Feb 202072.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Demetrio Gallaro (VIAF: 305323187)
Archbishop Giorgio Demetrio Gallaro (born ) Secretary of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlacePozzallo, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Demetrio Megalomartire, Cathedral, Piana degli Albanesi, Eparchy of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Oriental Churches.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2015
  • inca: CB, 31 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 2 Apr 2015
  • c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,511
  • opd/c1: CB, 24 Feb 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2020
  • ab: CB, 28 Feb 2020
  • 4t30: CB, 1 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast