Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ercole Lupinacci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1933Born
22 Nov 195925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
25 Mar 198147.3AppointedBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
6 Aug 198147.7Ordained BishopBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
30 Nov 198754.0AppointedBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
10 Aug 201076.7RetiredBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
6 Aug 201682.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ercole Lupinacci
Bishop Ercole Lupinacci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giorgio Albanese
Ordained BishopSan Demetrio Megalomartire di Tessalonica, Cathedral, Piana degli Albanesi, Eparchy of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Aug 2010
  • c1/d: CB, 8 Aug 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast