Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict XII

Jacques Fournier, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1280¹Born
19 Mar 131737.2AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
19 Mar 131737.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
2 Mar 132646.1AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
18 Dec 132747.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
18 Dec 132747.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 133454.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Jan 133555.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Apr 134262.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Fournier (VIAF: 36914465)
Pope Jacques Fournier O. Cist. (born 1280, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanté, Diocese of Pamiers, France
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame des Doms, Cathedral, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast