Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Forbes, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Uganda

Titular Bishop of Vaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1864Born
6 Oct 188824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Nov 191753.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Uganda
17 Nov 191753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
19 May 191854.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
13 Mar 192662.1DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Uganda

MicroData Summary for Jean Forbes
Bishop Jean Forbes M. Afr. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Uganda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIle Perrot, Canada
Ordained BishopRubaga

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 26
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,573
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,625

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast