Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Falzacappa

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1767Born
27 Oct 179932.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 181648.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
22 Jul 181649.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
27 Sep 181952.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
29 Sep 181952.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
10 Mar 182355.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ancona e Numana, Italy
10 Mar 182355.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182356.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
17 Nov 182356.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
23 May 182457.1ResignedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
7 Jan 182961.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
5 Jul 183063.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
22 Nov 183972.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 Nov 1840³73.6DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Falzacappa (VIAF: 232990029)
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Falzacappa (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorneto, Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Ordained BishopNuns of the Humility, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santissima Concezione, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
  • a cardinal for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 73, and Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1819, Number 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast